+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (136-3)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {877079/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-2)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {286687/1 Report Adopted
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- 5-304 - Article - Criminal Law
- 21-2A-01 - Article - Health - General
- 21-2A-02 - Article - Health - General
- 21-2A-03 - Article - Health - General
- 21-2A-04 - Article - Health - General
- 21-2A-05 - Article - Health - General
- 21-2A-06 - Article - Health - General
- 21-2A-07 - Article - Health - General
- 21-2A-08 - Article - Health - General
- 21-2A-09 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (4)
April 8, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 6, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
- Nays: 3
April 3, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 28, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor