+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (122-14)
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Analysis
+ − Statute Amended
- 7-202 - Article - Tax - Property
+ − Votes (4)
March 22, 2019: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 21, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 9, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 122
- Nays: 14