+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
- Favorable with Amendments {366889/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
366889/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
- 18-1901 - Article - Education
- 18-1902.1 - Article - Education
- 18-1904 - Article - Education
- 18-1905 - Article - Education
- 18-19A-05 - Article - Education
- 18-19B-05 - Article - Education
- 17-203 - Article - Estates and Trusts
- 11-203 - Article - State Finance and Procurement
- 9-803 - Article - State Government
- 10-205 - Article - Tax - General
- 10-207 - Article - Tax - General
- 10-208 - Article - Tax - General
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2016: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 31, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 18, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
March 17, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (67)
Type:
Primary Sponsor