+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/09 at 12:30 p.m.
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {315261/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
315261/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
April 1, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 28, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor