+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senators Smith, Zirkin, and Hough
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Senate Refuses to Recede
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Delegates Moon, Vallario, and B. Wilson
- Conference Committee Appointed
- House Requests Senate Recede
- House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
- Favorable with Amendments {138476/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {902110/1 Report Adopted
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2017: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 31, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 9, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
March 6, 2017: House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (94)
Type:
Primary Sponsor