+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Rules
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (99-37)
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Public Financing Act - Matching Fund Revisions (Maryland Fair Elections Act)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {125567/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Text - First - Public Financing Act - Matching Fund Revisions (Maryland Fair Elections Act)
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 13-235, 15-102, 15-103, 15-104, 15-104.1, 15-105, 15-106 through 15-111, 15-108, 15-113 - Article - Election Law
+ − Votes (3)
April 9, 2021: Third Reading Passed (99-37)
- Yeas: 99
- Nays: 37
January 18, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor