+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
- Third Reading Passed (109-29)
- Passed Enrolled
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-2)
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
- Favorable with Amendments {537872/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
- Favorable with Amendments {383191/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Third Reading Passed (113-23)
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
- Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
- Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-414 - Article - Labor and Employment
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 2, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 109
- Nays: 29
April 1, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 2
March 21, 2016: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (44)
Type:
Primary Sponsor