+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 265
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to place bill on Third Reading (Senator Conway) Adopted
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {726485/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
726485/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-306 - Article - General Provisions
+ − Votes (4)
April 8, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 18, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
March 17, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor