+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (123-11)
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {413391/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
- Hearing canceled
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters and Appropriations
+ − Amendment
413391/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 10-806 - Article - Economic Development
- 10-807 - Article - Economic Development
- 10-808 - Article - Economic Development
- 10-823 - Article - Economic Development
- 10-825 - Article - Economic Development
- 10-829 through 10-837 - Article - Economic Development
- 6-226 - Article - State Finance and Procurement
- 10-801 - Article - Economic Development
- 10-810 - Article - Economic Development
+ − Votes (5)
April 6, 2017: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 1, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 16, 2017: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 16, 2017: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 14, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 123
- Nays: 11
+ − Sponsors (35)
Speaker
Type:
Primary Sponsor