+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Failed (69-65)
- Motion vote previous question (Delegate Cane) Adopted
- Motion Tabled (Delegate Olszewski) Rejected (58-72)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {312014/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendment
312014/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-105 - Article - Criminal Procedure
+ − Votes (3)
March 13, 2014: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 11, 2014: House Floor - Motion Tabled (Olszewski) Rejected
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 72
March 11, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Failed
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 65
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor