+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 513
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Motion Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Rejected (45-92)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
- Third Reading Passed (123-15)
- Passed Enrolled
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
On April 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
- Favorable with Amendments {358970/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
- Favorable with Amendments {462917/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Third Reading Passed (136-3)
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (5)
April 9, 2016: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
April 7, 2016: House Floor - Motion Special Order until later today (O'Donnell) Rejected
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 92
April 7, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 123
- Nays: 15
April 4, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 17, 2016: House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor