+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 5, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (129-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {587772/1 Report Adopted
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {236588/1 Report Adopted
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2014: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 30, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 129
March 27, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46