+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
On April 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
- Rereferred to Finance
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {446781/1 Report Adopted
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
446781/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 9, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 4, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
March 28, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 25, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor