+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {963197/1 Report Adopted
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendment
963197/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (4)
March 27, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 9, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
March 6, 2017: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor