+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
On April 5, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (134-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {254337/1 Report Adopted
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (118-3)
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {794566/1 Report Adopted
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 30, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 134
March 24, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
February 10, 2014: House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsors (88)
Type:
Primary Sponsor