+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (127-12)
On April 9, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Walker) {553726/1 Adopted
- Special Order until later today (Delegate Walker) Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Reilly) {293025/1 Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Moon) {683528/1 Rejected
- Special Order until next session (Delegate Walker) Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Moon) {683528/1
- Favorable with Amendments {475466/1 Report Adopted
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 13-935 - Article - Tax - General
- 13-936 - Article - Tax - General
- 13-937 through 13-940 - Article - Tax - General
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
April 5, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 127
- Nays: 12
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor