+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Statute Amended
- 8-1808.2 - Article - Natural Resources
+ − Votes (4)
March 26, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
February 25, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
February 22, 2016: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor