+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Maryland Economic Development Corporation - Student Housing - Applications and Occupancy Agreements
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
- Referred Budget and Taxation
On March 19, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (130-0)
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Text - Third - Maryland Economic Development Corporation - Student Housing - Applications and Occupancy Agreements
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {993125/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
- Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - Maryland Economic Development Corporation – Student Housing Requirements – Leases and Health or Safety Emergencies
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-131, 10-132 - Article - Economic Development
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2022: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
March 19, 2022: Third Reading Passed (130-0)
- Yeas: 130
March 18, 2022: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
January 27, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor