+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
- Hearing 4/05 at 1:15 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Text - Third - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Bronchodilator and Epinephrine Availability and Use - Policies
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {253022/1 Adopted
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - Public and Nonpublic Schools – Bronchodilator Availability and Use – Policy
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 7-426.6, 7-426.7 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (2)
March 10, 2022: Third Reading Passed (137-0)
- Yeas: 137
January 27, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor