+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
February 25, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
February 22, 2016: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor