+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Eligibility for Enrollment and Participation (Independent Agency Health Insurance Option Act)
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- Text - Enrolled - State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Eligibility for Enrollment and Participation (Independent Agency Health Insurance Option Act)
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (126-7)
- House Concurs Senate Amendments
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {683828/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred Budget and Taxation
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (130-0)
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Text - Third - State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Eligibility for Enrollment and Participation (Independent Agency Health Insurance Option Act)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {693727/1 Adopted
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On January 30, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
- Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Eligibility for Enrollment and Participation (Independent Agency Health Insurance Option Act)
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 2-515.3 - Article - State Personnel and Pensions
+ − Votes (5)
April 8, 2022: Third Reading Passed (126-7)
- Yeas: 126
- Nays: 7
April 4, 2022: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
March 3, 2022: Third Reading Passed (130-0)
- Yeas: 130
February 28, 2022: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
January 30, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor