+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Certifying Providers
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 187
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
- Referred Finance
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Text - Third - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Certifying Providers
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {726784/1 Adopted
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
- Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Text - First - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Certifying Providers
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 13-3301, 13-3303 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (4)
March 16, 2020: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45
March 6, 2020: Third Reading Passed (136-0)
- Yeas: 136
March 3, 2020: Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
February 4, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor