+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Maryland Health Care Commission – Palliative Care Services – Workgroup
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
- Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred Finance
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-1)
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Text - Third - Maryland Health Care Commission – Palliative Care Services – Workgroup
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
- Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - Maryland Health Care Commission – Palliative Care Services – Workgroup
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2022: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45
March 10, 2022: Third Reading Passed (136-1)
- Yeas: 136
- Nays: 1
March 7, 2022: Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
February 8, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor