+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (96-34)
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Commission on Student Behavioral Health and Mental Health Treatment
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {985165/1 Adopted
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Text - First - Commission on Student Behavioral Health and Mental Health Treatment
- First Reading Ways and Means
On September 22, 2020 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2021: Third Reading Passed (96-34)
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 34
January 21, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor