+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (127-0)
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senators Peters, Robey, and DeGrange
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Senate Refuses to Recede
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Requests Senate Recede
- House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Delegates Frick, A. Miller, and Serafini
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {439438/1 Report Adopted
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {465269/1 Report Adopted
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
April 3, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 127
April 1, 2013: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 19, 2013: House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor