+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-2)
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senators Young, Kagan, and Salling
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Senate Refuses to Recede
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Requests Senate Recede
- House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Delegates M. Washington, Tarlau, and Metzgar
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {614938/1 Report Adopted
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-2)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {845962/1 Report Adopted
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 9, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
- Nays: 2
April 8, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 16, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor