+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (140-0)
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (4)
March 24, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 7, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 140
March 4, 2019: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor