+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-2)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2014: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 22, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 6, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 134
- Nays: 2
March 3, 2014: House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor