+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (140-0)
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Statute Amended
- 13-1803 - Article - Criminal Law
+ − Votes (2)
March 14, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 140
March 13, 2017: House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor