+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-2)
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {884132/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {435264/1 Report Adopted
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
April 3, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 2
March 16, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (86)
Type:
Primary Sponsor