+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {947871/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {756380/1 Report Adopted
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 19-3B-01 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (4)
April 10, 2015: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 9, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
April 4, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 3, 2015: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor