+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/20 at 1:30 p.m.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 15, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (130-0)
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Votes (4)
March 24, 2014: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 19, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 13, 2014: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 12, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 130
+ − Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor