+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {760612/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendment
760612/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (2)
March 18, 2017: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
March 16, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
+ − Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor