+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On December 6, 2021 in the House:
- Motion Special Order vote on veto until next session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor's Veto Letter
- Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Enrolled - Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2021
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (94-37)
- House Concurs Senate Amendments
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (30-17)
- Floor Amendment {713323/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (19-27)
- Floor Amendment {113727/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (20-26)
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment {223726/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected
- Favorable with Amendments {379934/1 (Budget and Taxation Committee) Adopted
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {379934/1
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
- Referred Budget and Taxation
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (97-40)
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2021
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment {753429/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (48-88)
- Floor Amendment {713120/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (42-94)
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Mautz) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {695162/1 Adopted
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
On December 22, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Text - First - Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2021
- Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
- Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
On October 1, 2020 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-106 - Article - Tax - General
+ − Votes (9)
April 9, 2021: Third Reading Passed (94-37)
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 37
April 8, 2021: Floor Amendment {713323/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (19-27)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 27
April 8, 2021: Floor Amendment {113727/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (20-26)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 26
April 8, 2021: Third Reading Passed (30-17)
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 17
February 26, 2021: Third Reading Passed (97-40)
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 40
February 25, 2021: Floor Amendment {713120/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (42-94)
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 94
February 25, 2021: Floor Amendment {753429/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (48-88)
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 88
February 22, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
December 22, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor