+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
On April 9, 2022 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (32-10)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (95-40)
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Text - Third - Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {613326/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
- Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 1-401, 1-406, 9-11A-01 through 9-11A-23, 9-217.2 - Article - Environment
- 6-226 - Article - State Finance and Procurement
- 8-403 - Article - State Government
+ − Votes (4)
April 9, 2022: Third Reading Passed (32-10)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 10
March 17, 2022: Third Reading Passed (95-40)
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 40
January 25, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor