+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 266882/1 Report Adopted
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
266882/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 18-109 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (4)
March 24, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
February 28, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139