+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 597
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Enrolled - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (96-43)
- House Concurs Senate Amendments
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {648677/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (94-40)
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Judicial Proceedings
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
On March 20, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {192813/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
- Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Text - First - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
- First Reading Judiciary
On October 30, 2020 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 12, 2021: Third Reading Passed (96-43)
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 43
April 9, 2021: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
March 22, 2021: Third Reading Passed (94-40)
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 40
March 20, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
January 15, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor