+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Public Ethics Violations and Crimes – Prohibitions and Penalties
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 164
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Text - Enrolled - Public Ethics Violations and Crimes – Prohibitions and Penalties
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (130-0)
- House Concurs Senate Amendments
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {444337/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-1)
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Text - Third - Public Ethics Violations and Crimes – Prohibitions and Penalties
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {650015/1 Adopted
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
- Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
- Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 20, 2020 in the House:
- Text - First - Public Ethics - Executive Branch - Lobbying by Former Secretaries of Principal Departments (Shut the Revolving Door Act of 2020)
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 18, 2020: Third Reading Passed (130-0)
- Yeas: 130
March 18, 2020: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45
March 11, 2020: Third Reading Passed (137-1)
- Yeas: 137
- Nays: 1
January 21, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor