+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-2)
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senators Norman, Muse, and Raskin
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Senate Refuses to Recede
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Requests Senate Recede
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Delegates Beidle, Szeliga, and Lam
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {258370/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-2)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {850118/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 11, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 134
- Nays: 2
April 10, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
April 9, 2015: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 23, 2015: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor