+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
- Third Reading Passed (138-1)
- Passed Enrolled
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 9, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Delegates C. Wilson, Brooks, and S. Howard
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Refuses to Recede
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Senators Astle, Klausmeier, and Reilly
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- House Refuses Concur - Senate Amendments
- House Requests Senate Recede
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments {627679/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-1)
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments {203590/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
- Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 8, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
- Nays: 1
April 7, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 28, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
February 9, 2016: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor