+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfavorable Report by Finance
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (94-45)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
- Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Votes (2)
February 19, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 45
February 16, 2016: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor