+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing cancelled
- Hearing 3/20 at 2:00 p.m.
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Votes (4)
March 29, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 28, 2013: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
February 21, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
February 18, 2013: House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor