+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 603
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Enrolled - State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (127-10)
- House Concurs Senate Amendments
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {454033/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (131-4)
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {206788/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On December 23, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
- Text - First - State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing
- Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
On October 29, 2020 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 14-5G-01 through 14-5G-29 - Article - Health Occupations
+ − Votes (5)
April 12, 2021: Third Reading Passed (127-10)
- Yeas: 127
- Nays: 10
April 12, 2021: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
March 22, 2021: Third Reading Passed (131-4)
- Yeas: 131
- Nays: 4
December 23, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor