+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Consumption MC 09-20
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 157
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Text - Third - Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Consumption MC 09-20
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
- Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 20, 2020 in the House:
- Text - First - Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Consumption MC 09-20
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Statute Amended
- 25-102, 25-2001, 25-2002, 25-2004, 25-2005, 25-2006, 25-2007 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
+ − Votes (4)
March 18, 2020: Third Reading Passed (44-0)
- Yeas: 44
March 3, 2020: Third Reading Passed (137-0)
- Yeas: 137
February 24, 2020: Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
February 3, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor