+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (140-0)
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {655862/1 Report Adopted
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
655862/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 15-106.1 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 14, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 140
March 12, 2015: House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor