+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221
On April 5, 2014 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {262112/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Amendment
262112/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-207 - Article - Public Safety
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2014: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 26, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 13, 2014: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 11, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor