+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
- Third Reading Passed (115-20)
- Passed Enrolled
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
- Favorable with Amendments {477872/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (106-31)
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments {343691/1 Report Adopted
- Motion Special Order until 2/11 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
- Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 11-601 - Article - Labor and Employment
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 28, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 20
March 28, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
February 9, 2016: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor