+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred Judicial Proceedings
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Penalties for Failure to Pay Video Toll and Electronic Tolling Performance Audit
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {663327/1 Adopted
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - Vehicle Laws – Failure to Pay Video Toll – Penalties
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
On October 8, 2021 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 21-1414, 21-1415 - Article - Transportation
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2022: Third Reading Passed (139-0)
- Yeas: 139
February 11, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor