+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
On January 1, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On November 14, 2013 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Vote
March 31, 2014: House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor