+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (131-0)
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Special Order until 2/12 (Delegate Olszewski) Adopted
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Environmental Matters
+ − Statute Amended
- 2-103 - Article - Transportation
+ − Votes (4)
April 7, 2014: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 29, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
February 18, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 131
February 10, 2014: House - Committee - Environmental Matters
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor